Archief van
Categorie: alle categorieën

Squares, sums of 2 (1) 1

Squares, sums of 2 (1) 1

Squares, sums of 2 (1).

Talking about divisility we found that a number is divisible if it ca be written as twice the sum of two squares on a different way.
If a number can be written as only once the sum of tho squares, it is a prime number.

We can spare ourselves a lot of work if we think about the possibilities before going to work. Are there number which cannot be the sum of two squares? Yes, there are: every number 3(4) cannot be written as the sum of two squares.

The square of any even number, 0(2) or 2(4) is 0(4). The square of any odd number, 1(4) or 3(4) is 1(4). It is evident: when we add 0 + 1(4) the only result is 1(4). When we add 1+1 we get 2(4), so even numbers may be the sum of two squares.

The better is to invoke modulo 8 for determine if a number is the sum of two squares, as we will have additions which exceed 100. An even number squared is either 0(8) or 4(8). Every odd number squared is 1(8). So the sum of two squares may be 0(8), 1(8), 4(8) or 5(8).

It is also useful to invoke mod 9, as this will help us in economising the quantity of work we’ll have to do. For the squares mod 9 there are the possibilities: 0, 1, 4 and 7 mod 9. In sums of squares there are the possibilities: 0, 1, 2, 4, 5, 7 and 8 mod 9. 3 and 6 mod 9 is impossible, as you can easily deduct.

We’ll go at search.

281 is the sum of which squares? As 81 can only be composed by 00 + 81 and 25 + 56. 281 = 2 mod 9, so we can ignore 15 as a candidate as 15² = 0 (9). 5²=25, 16²=256, 25+256=281, and here we have the combination we were looking for.

1349, 8(9). Possibilities: 24, OH (Odd Hundred) + 25, always EH (Even Hundred). Under 1349 we only have 18² = indeed OH, but as 324 = 0(9) 18 drops out. 7² = 49, 4(9) , 20² = 400 = 4(9), 30² = 0(9), and is to low, so 1349 cannot be written as the sum of two squares.

4178. 2(9). As 78 can be composed by 09 + 69, 29 + 49 and 89 + 89, we do better to divide by 2 and have 2089, 1(9), and EH 89 can only be composed by 89, always EH + 00(EH), or 64(EH) and 25, always EH. List of candidates: 5, 8, 15, 17, 33, 45. Which ones drop out and why? 5, as 5² = 7(9) , 15² as  2089 – 225 = 1864 and 1864 is no square, 17 as 17² + 1800 = 2089 but 1800 is no square, 33 as 33² = 1089 but 1000 is no square. What remains is the combination 8² + 45² =2089.
In case of a 89 (OH) either the 64 or 00 have to be OH.

21473, 8(9). 8 mod 9 can be composed as 1 + 7, 4 + 4.  9 has always EH, + 64 EH, or 24 EH + 49, always EH, 44 OH ad 29 (OH) is always EH, 04 OH as 69 is always OH, and 84 OH as 89 is always EH.
We can economise our labour by doubling, 42946, 7(9) because 46 can only be composed by 25, always EH and 21, always OH.
All the squares other than 0 mod 9 and 7(9) drop out automatically.
The candidates and eventual drop outs are 5, 15, 39, 45, 61, 75, 85, 89, 105, 111, 125, 135, 139, 145, 155, 161, 165, 175, 185, 189, 195, 205. Here we can stop, as 205. In this enumeration we can immediately skip the numbers 61, 89, 125, 145,155 and 161 because their squares are neither 0 nor 7 mod 9.

We continue. : 5, 5² = 25 and 42921 is no square, 15, as 15² = 225 and 42721 is no square, 39, as 39³ = 1521and there is no square ending on 425 ( nor there is a square …825), 45 as 40921 is no square, 61² = 4(9), 85²=7225, and (full hit): 35721 is the square of 189. 105 drops out as 31921 is no square. 111 is another hit: 42946-111² = 30625 which is 175².
We have now 42946 = 175² +111², and 189² + 85².
We reduce: 21473 is the sum of the following squares = (175 ± 111) ÷ 2 = 143² and 32² and (189 ± 85) ÷ 2 = 137² + 52². Now we can conclude that 21473 is divisible. In another theme we’ll work out which ones are the factors.

Square roots, integer 1

Square roots, integer 1

Square roots, integer

Doing square roots is just the opposite of squaring. This seems to force an open door. I hope to be able to explain you how important the basic knowledge of squares is to facilitate integer square roots.

Our Long, long ago my math teacher spoke about the check on an operation made.

Eg having done an integer sqrt ending on 1 the last digit of the answer should be a 1 or a 9. Similarly sqrt 4 last digit is 2 or 8, sqrt 6 is 4 or 6 etc. This brougt me to an idea to investigate the structure in the squares.

1² 1
2² 4
3² 9
4² 16
5² 25
6² 36
7² 49
8² 64
9² 81
10² 100
The left column speaks for itself. But have a look at the right one, and especially at the last digits of the squares. We see that the 1 did not change, neither did the 5 and the 6, and of course the 0. Furthermore the 4 got a 6, 2,and 8 got a 4 and 3 and 7 got a 9. In the right column 2,3,7 and 8 disappeared from the right column.
And there is more: 1+9=10, 2+8=10, 3+7=10 etc. So squares with identical last digits have a “mirror effect”.

This brought me to the question if on a bigger scale there were also such effects. As from my 10th year I know all the 2×2 multiplications by heart this investigation was not very difficult, as there are squares in too.

1² (0)1
49² 2401
51² 2601
99² 9801
Have a look at this table. Immediately you see the last digits of the squares all being 01. Besides 1+99=100, 49+51=100, 99-49=50, 51-1=50. Every mathematician can give you the explanation of this appearance.

√5184. The first digit of the answer must be 7 as 49<51<64. As the last digit of the radient is 4 the last digit of the answer has to be either 2 or 8.
Now there are more methods to find the 2nd digit of the answer. 70² + 2×2×70 = 5180, so it lies at hand that the final answer is 72.

One can also calculate:
√5184.
The first lower square is 7²=49, so the fist digit of the answer is 7. 51-49=2, to divide by 2 =1 and then to multiply with 10=10. Next is to append the half of the following digit, 8÷2=4. Add 10+4=14 and divide by 7=2, and the answer is complete: 72.

For bigger numbers knowledge of the squares till 100 is possibly not a must, however it is very skilful.

√66049.
As 625<660<676, the First digits of the answer are 25. Now subtract 660-625=35÷2=17.5
17.5×10 = 175 + append 4÷2=2. 175+2=177÷25=7 r 2. Answer so far 257.
2×10=20+(9÷2)= 24.5 – 7²/2= 0÷25=0, so answer 257,0. Suffice it to say that we write 257.

√46090521.
4489<4609<4624, so first digits 67.
4609-4489=120÷2=60×10 + half appended digit (0)= 600÷67=8r 64. Answer so far 678.
64×10 + half of appended next digit =642.5- 8²/2=610.5÷67=9 r 7.5. Answer so far 6789.
7.5×10 + half of appended 2= 76-8×9=4÷67=0 r 4. answer so far 6789,0
4×10 + half of appended 1 = 40,5-9²/2= 0÷67=0r 0 Answer so far 6789,00. We write 6789.

The bigger the number, the more challenging it will be.
√188077475041. Let’s write it as follows 188077 475041. He who is confident with the squares till 1000 will see that the three first digits of the answer are 433 ad 187489<188077<188356. Looking at f041 we’ll study the squares ending on 5041 and will soon see one of the candidates is 071 as this number squared is 5041. To get 75041 we have to get 70000. 70000÷2 =35000, and 35071²= 1229975041. And 75041= 1(32). So the basic number has to be either 1, 15, 17 or 31(32).

This is a good opportunity to introduce the quadrant/octant theme. It was Robert Fountain who draw my attention on this theme, which is a welcome enrichment for doing square roots.
We can find the quadrant by taking the first six digits of the radiant, and subtract the nearest lower square. Then multiply by 2 and divide the result by the first three digits of the answer.

188077- 187489= 588. 588×2=1176÷433=± 2,7. We have now the third quadrant. First quadrant 1-250, second 251-500, third quadrant 501-750, fourth quadrant 751-1000.
In this case as 2,7 is far over 2 the quadrant is 3: 501-750.

For finding the octant, which means more accuracy, we take the same difference, in this case 588 and multiply × 4=2352÷433=± 5,5 so the sixth octant. Octant 1 = 001-125, octant 2 = 126-250, octant 3 = 251-375, octant 4 = 376-500, octant 5 = 501-625, octant 6 = 626-750, octant 7 = 751-875, octant 8 = 876-1000.
In this case 626-750.

There are 8 numbers squared ending on 041, for of them OT, Odd Thousand: 071, 321, 679 and 929. For ending on 5041 there are 0071, 6321, 3679 and 8929. Out of these four there is one which is in the 6th octant, 3679, and now we can combine 433 and (3)679, to get 433679 as the final answer.
Check: the radiant is 18+80+77+47+50+41= 7+3+3+6+8=5(11). So the answer has to be 4(11).
43+36+79=10+3+2=4(11).

Rekenen is leuk!

Rekenen is leuk!

Vermenigvuldigen.

Moeilijk is het meest voorkomende woord dat valt bij deze bewerking, in het basis onderwijs ook wel keersommen genoemd. Wie dat goed kan is echt een knappe kop. Aan de basis ervan ligt de kennis van de tafels van 1-10. Ik keek er bepaald van op toen ik een meisje van 8 jaar hoorde jammeren dat de tafels zo moeilijk zijn, en ze begreep “helemaal niks” van de tafel van drie. Niettemin: al mijn controlevragen werden snel en zonder uitzondering correct beantwoord. Is dit nu een afweermechanisme? Zeggen dat iets vreeeeeeeselijk moeilijk is in de hoop het dan niet meer te hoeven doen van de ouders? Ik ben alleen maar een rekenaar, en helaas geen zielkundige. Maar geloven doe ik het niet en ik kan het niet ook. Want wat valt eraan te begrijpen? Ik zie geen andere oplossing dan de tafels gewoonweg uit het hoofd te leren, er is niets aan te begrijpen. Ze vormen de basis van elke vermenigvuldiging.

Bij het vermenigvuldigen maken alle rekenwonders gebruik van de zgn. kruismethode. Ik leerde hem in december 1959 van Wim Klein. En wie schetst mijn verbazing, toen ik in de zomer van 1983, op een camping in Frankrijk, in contact kwam met een oudere heer uit St. Denis. Hij was vertegenwoordiger en al snel werden er enkele dingen uitgerekend. Na het ontvangen van enkele complimenten over mijn snelle rekenen legde ik hem de kruismethode uit en:………..die kende hij ook.

U bent nu natuurlijk zo brandnieuwsgierig geworden dat ik die methode nu wel moet gaan uitleggen.

1 Vermenigvuldigen van twee getallen van twee cijfers

Eerst uitleg over de gebruikte symbolen, AO, B2 enz, in de vorm van eenvoudige algebra. Elk getal tot de nulde macht = 1. Als het deeltal en de deler gelijk zijn aan elkaar mag je de exponenten aftrekken: 105 ÷ 10² = 10³. Dus 10¹ ÷ 10¹ = 100 =1. Dus A0 staat voor de eenheden, A1 voor de tientallen, B3 zijn duizendtallen.

Kijkt u naar de volgende pagina, onder 1, voor het vermenigvuldigen van twee getallen van twee cijfers, onder 1.

Eerste bewerking, het vermenigvuldigen van de eenheden, A0B0, waarmee we de eenheden van het antwoord verkrijgen. 9×7 = 63, 3 opschrijven, 6 transporteren. Meest rechtse cijfer van het antwoord dus 3. Dan het kruis: de vermenigvuldiging van eenheden maal tientallen, B0A1, 7 ×2 = 14 + de 6 van het transport, 20 + B1A0, 3 × 9 = 27, totaal 47, waarvan we de 7 opschrijven en de 4 transporteren. We hebben dus nu de tientallen van het antwoord bepaald, dat er nu uitziet als .. 73. Tenslotte A1B1, de tientallen, die met elkaar vermenigvuldigd ons de honderdtallen van het antwoord opleveren. Nu krijgen we 3 × 2 = 6 + de 4 van het transport, samen 10, waardoor we het eindantwoord van de vermenigvuldiging 29 × 37 bepalen op 1073. Let wel, dit antwoord hebben we verkregen zonder het maken van tussennotities.

De vraag die ik u, vereerde lezer nu vrijmoedig voorleg is deze: “Is dit nu echt moeilijk”? Ik heb eens de weinig vleiende opmerking gehoord: “Je lijkt net een varken, dat al schreeuwt voor het geslagen wordt”. Ik heb zo vaak de opmerking gehoord “Dat kan ik niet”of “dat is veel te moeilijk” nog voordat geprobeerd was het vraagstuk op te lossen.

De vraag komt op “waar komt die kruismethode nu toch vandaan”? Ik heb twee boekjes gedownload “Das Ferrol’sche neue Rechenverfahren”, van Dr.Ferrol, uitgegeven in 1913 en “Geheimnisse der Rechenkünstler” van Dr. Philipp Maennchen, ook uitgegeven in 1913. Beide schrijvers geven aan dat de oorsprong van de kruismethode tot de Indiërs is terug te voeren.

In woorden:
Eenheden ontstaan uitsluitend door het vermenigvuldigen van eenheden maal eenheden.
Tientallen ontstaan door eenheden maal tientallen + tientallen maal eenheden + een eventueel transport van de eenheden.
Honderdtallen ontstaan door eenheden maal honderden + honderden maal eenheden + een eventueel transport van tientallen.
Duizendtallen ontstaan door eenheden maal duizenden + duizenden maal eenheden + tientallen maal honderden + honderden maal tientallen + een eventueel transport van honderden.
Tienduizendtallen: tientallen maal duizenden en duizenden maal tientallen + honderden maal honderden + een eventueel transport van duizenden.
Honderdduizenden: honderden maal duizenden + duizenden maal honderden + een eventueel transport van tienduizenden.
Miljoenen: duizenden maal duizenden +een eventueel transport van honderdduizenden.

2 Vermenigvuldigen van twee getallen van drie cijfers

Onder 2 vindt u de uitwerking van een vermenigvuldiging van twee getallen van drie cijfers met elkaar.

Wie kiezen als eerste getal 293 in formule vorm geschreven als a2a1a0 en 847 geschreven als b2b1b0.

Achtereenvolgens doet u:
7 × 3 = 21, 1 noteren, 2 transporteren, 1e cijfer van het antwoord 1
2(tr) + 4 ×3 = 14 + 9 ×7 = 77, 7 noteren, 7 transporteren, antwoord zo ver nu 71
7 (tr) + 7×2 = 21 + 8 ×3 (24) = 45, + 9 ×4 (36) = 81, 1 noteren, 8 transporteren, antwoord zo ver nu 171
8 (tr) + 2×4 = 16 + 8 × 9 (72) = 88, 8 noteren, 8 transporteren, antwoord zover 8171
8(tr) + 8 ×2 = 24, waardoor het eindantwoord wordt 248171.

Voor de volledigheid wordt nog een vermenigvuldiging van twee getallen van vier cijfers uitgewerkt, waarbij ik direct opmerk dat dit de nodige oefening vraagt, en wat ik niet aanbeveel zonder dat men de vorige bewerkingen goed beheerst.

3 Vermenigvuldigen van twee getallen van vier cijfers

De getallen 2345, in de formule voorgesteld als a3a2a1a0 en – u vermoedde het al- en 6789, voorgesteld als b3b2b1b0. Kijkt u eerst naar de formule en zie hoe de bewerking heel logisch wordt opgebouwd vanaf de eenheden naar de duizenden. Kijkt u ook naar de beschrijving bij “in woorden “.

U doet het volgende:

9 × 5 = 45 , 5 noteren 4 transporteren. Antwoord zo ver 5
4 + 9 × 4 (36) = 40 + 8 × 5 (40) = 80, 0 noteren, 8 transporteren, antwoord zo ver 05
8 + 9 × 3 (27) = 35 + 7× 5 (35) = 70 + 8 × 4 (32) = 102, 2 noteren, 10 transporteren, antwoord zo ver 205
10 + 9 × 2 (18) = 28 + 8 × 3 (24) = 52 + 7 × 4 (28) = 80 + 6 × 5 (30) = 110, 0 noteren, 11 transporteren, antwoord zo ver 0205
11 + 8 × 2 (16) = 27 + 7 × 3 (21) = 48 + 6 × 4 (24) = 72, 2 noteren, 7 transporteren, antwoord zo ver 20205
7 + 7 × 2 (14) = 21 + 6 × 3 (18) = 39, 9 noteren, 3 transporteren, antwoord zo ver 920205
3 + 6 × 2 (12) = 15, eindantwoord 15920205.

Later zal ik nog behandelen hoe we deze uitkomst op juistheid kunnen controleren, bij het zgn. modulo rekenen,

4 De kruismethode en de rekenwonders

Zonder aanspraak te maken op volledigheid: alle rekenwonders bedienen zich van de kruismethode en werken met één cijfer tegelijk, ook als het gaat om vermenigvuldigingen van twee getallen van acht cijfers.

En ik zelf dan? Om te beginnen: toen Wim Klein me de kruismethode bijbracht ried hij me aan met twee cijfers tegelijk te werken, omdat ik alle vermenigvuldigingen van twee cijfers uit het hoofd ken. Toch zie ik geen kans dit voordeel uit te buiten. Bij het onderzoek aan de universiteit van Leipzig bleek ik veruit de snelste te zijn bij de 2 × 2 vermenigvuldigingen, maar zie toch geen kans de hoofdprijs te verwerven. Het meest voor de hand ligt dit: de tijd die ik win met het snellere vermenigvuldigen verlies ik bij het optellen van de grotere getallen.

Ter verduidelijking geef ik aan hoe ik dan 2 getallen van 2 cijfers vermenigvuldig, het eerdere voorbeeld 2345 × 6789.

45 × 89 = 40 05, 05 noteren, 40 transporteren. Antwoord nu 05
89 × 23 = 20 47, + 40 = 20 87 + 67 × 45 (30 15) = 51 02, 02 noteren, 51 transporteren. Antwoord nu 02 05
67 × 23 = 15 41 + 51 = 15 92. Eindantwoord 15 92 02 05.

© A.W.A.P. Bouman

Optellen

Optellen

Optellen

Optellen is een basale bewerking, waar zelfs kleine kinderen al voor hun schooltijd mee kennis maken. Weet u wat nu zo vervelend is? Het is zo basaal dat er nauwelijks iets over te vertellen valt. Maar je moet het wel kunnen: zonder optellen en aftrekken is geen enkele bewerking mogelijk. Want vermenigvuldigen is eigenlijk versneld optellen en machtsverheffen is hoog versneld optellen.

Uit het begin van mijn vertegenwoordigerstijd – 1968- herinner ik me dat de boekhouders van de klanten in razend tempo, rekenmachines waren er nog niet, enorme cijferkolommen in een ijzingwekkend snel tempo foutloos konden optellen. Als het om vermenigvuldigen ging legden ze het bij mij af, maar bij het optellen had ik geen schijn van kans, ook al werkte ik in groepen van twee cijfers tegelijk.

Mij is verteld dat leerling accountants beginnen met kolommen in het telefoonboek op te tellen met de rekenmachine. Als er een fout in zit is dat geen probleem, het gaat erom het snelle aanslaan onder de knie te krijgen.

In de Duitse toernooien is een van de typen opgaven het optellen van tien getallen van 10 cijfers, en dat 10×.

Een zeer snelle opteller is Divesh Shah, uit Singapore. Hij kan zeer snel een groot aantal naast elkaar geschreven losse cijfers feilloos optellen. Alberto Coto – Spanjaard- is er ook erg goed in .Een snel opkomende ster is Mohammad El Mir, in 2003 geboren in  Libanon. Hij heeft o.a. een wereldrecord in het optellen van 250 getallen van twee cijfers, die slechts 0,6 seconden zichtbaar zijn. .

In mijn gedachten is het zeer goed mogelijk flinke optellingen te maken door de getallen op te splitsen in groepjes van twee cijfers en die onder elkaar gezet optellen, geen grote sprongen en af en toe even ademhalen. Het is handig om ter controle de modulo 9 te testen, waarover later.

Een belangrijk begrip bij het optellen is het complement. daaronder wordt verstaan het getal dat aanvult tot de volgende macht van 10. Zo is 8 het complement van 2; 28 het complement van 72 en 128 het complement van 872. Merk op dat de caissières in de supermarkt bij het geven van het wisselgeld werken met het complement van het gegeven geldstuk.

We gaan optellen de getallen 27398, 6542 en 9528. We schrijven de getallen als in de tabel en we gaan optellen van rechts naar links. 98 + 42 + 28 = 168, waarvan we de 68 noteren en de 1 transporteren. Dan 1 + 95 + 65 + 73. Nu handig zijn: 65 en 95 eindigen op een 5 en laten zich daardoor heel makkelijk optellen, 1 60. Dan nog de 1, die moeten we natuurlijk niet vergeten! Met de 73 = 74, met 1 60 erbij wordt 2 34. 34 opschrijven en de 2 onthouden. Tenslotte 2 +1 = 3 + de 2 van het onthouden wordt een 5.

2 73 98
65 42
1 95 28
 
5 34 68

Nog een uit de MSO: 296545 + 497815 + 609917 + 328971. Bij de MSO staan de getallen naast elkaar. Dat is best wennen maar ook hier baart oefening kunst. In gedachten doen we dit:
29 65 43 + 49 78 15 + 60 09 17 + 32 89 71. Het beste is van rechts naar links te werken, voor het transport. 71 + 17 = 88, erg makkelijk, 15 en 45 = 60, ook al niet moeilijk, totaal 148, waarvan we 48 opschrijven en 1 transporteren. Antwoord zo ver xx 48. Nu 1 + 89 = 90 + 99 = 189, + 78 = 267, + 65 = 332, 32 opschrijven, 3 transporteren. Antwoord zo ver 32 48. Nu 3 + 32 = 35 + 60 = 95, + 49 = 144 + 29 = 173. Eindantwoord 173 32 48. Dit kunnen we controleren d.m.v. de 9-proef als volgt: 2+7 =9, niet meer naar kijken, 3 + 8 (9 ook buiten beschouwing houden), = 11= 2(9) . 65 42, voor de 9-proef alleen 6+2 = 8(9), 1(9)528= 7(9). We tellen nu op 2+8+7, 2+7=0(9), we houden alleen de 8. Het eindantwoord van de optelling zou nu ook 8(9) moeten zijn en dat is het – gelukkig- ook, immers – we worden al handig: 5+4= 0(9) 3+6 eveneens. Wat blijft is de 8, en onze optelling is dus goed gelukt.

Bij decimale optellingen is het zaak heel goed uit te kijken, want een 0 als laatste decimaal wordt niet vermeld. Bijvoorbeeld 379,281 + 489,35 + 624,963. In gedachten doen we hier dus 281 + 350 = 631 + 963 = 1, 594.

Bij het optellen laat ik, werkend met twee cijfers tegelijk, de negen proef op de achtergrond meelopen.

© A.W.A.P. Bouman

modulorekenen 2

modulorekenen 2

Modulorekenen 2.

Onderstaande tabel is te gebruiken voor modulo 11 rekenen. De gele vakken hebben betrekking op de kwadraten. Voor het vermenigvuldigen van een getal 5(11) met een getal 6(11) vinden we de modulo door vanuit de meest linkse kolom bij 5 naar rechts te gaan en vanuit de bovenste rij vanuit 6 naar beneden. Waar de vakken elkaar snijden staat het antwoord, in dit geval 8(11). Bij kwadraten, bijv. van 5, gaat u vanuit de meest linkse kolom bij 5 naar rechts en vanuit de bovenste rij bij 5 naar omlaag. De vakken snijden elkaar bij 3. 5²= bijgevolg 3(11). De kwadraten zijn geel gemarkeerd. Merkt u ook op dat er sprake is van een spiegel effect: de kwadraten van 1 en 10, 2 en 9, 3 en 8 enz. hebben dezelfde modulo 11.

We zullen ons nu zetten aan een deling waarbij modulo rekenen een belangrijke rol speelt.

99024÷48.
Daar het deeltal 5 cijfers heeft en de deler 2 heeft het antwoord 4 cijfers. Daar 96000< 99024 < 100800 begint het antwoord met 20.

Met opzet zijn deeltal en deler gekozen met machten van 2, waardoor binnen een gegeven honderdtal 4 mogelijkheden openstaan. Immers zowel 13, 38, 63 en 88 × 48 leveren alle een antwoord op eindigend op 24.
In gedachten schrijven we het deeltal als 9 90 24, 2(11). De deler 48 = 4(11). We nemen in de meest linker kolom de 4 en stoppen bij het cijfer 2. Van daaruit gaan we naar boven en vinden in de bovenste rij de 6. We weten nu dat het quotiënt moet zijn 6(11). De eerste twee cijfers van het quotiënt 20 = 9(11). Het totale antwoord is 6(11). Om van 9(11) te komen bij 6(11) rekenen we of -3(11) of 8(11). Van de mogelijkheden 13, 38, 63 en 88 voldoet alleen 63 aan de eis 8(11). Het volledige antwoord op de deling is dus 2063.

We zullen ons nu wagen aan een opgaande kubieke wortel en daarbij het getal 11 te hulp roepen. Gemakshalve zal eerst een tabel gemaakt worden.

Omdat 3 een oneven macht is treedt geen spiegeleffect op, maar het “tegenvoetereffect”. Dit heeft tot aangenaam gevolg dat men voldoende heeft aan de resultaten van 1 t/m 5, de “tegenvoeters laten zich hieruit makkelijk herleiden: wie weet dat 3³=5(11) kan onmiddellijk concluderen dat 8³ moet zijn 6(11).

De middelste kolom is zeer bruikbaar om het eerste cijfer van het antwoord te bepalen.

³√ 283593393, voor het gemak geschreven als 2 83 59 33 93. We gebruiken de cijfers 283 om het eerste cijfer van het antwoord te bepalen. 216<283<343. Dit houdt in dat het eerste cijfer van het antwoord 6 is. Het laatste cijfer van de opgave bepaalt het laatste cijfer van het antwoord. De 3 wil dus zeggen dat het laatste cijfer van het antwoord is 7, antwoord zo ver 6X7.

We gaan nu bepalen de modulo 11 van de opgave. Omdat we zo slim zijn, zien we direct 33 die we bij de optelling kunnen negeren. Wat we natuurlijk ook direct zien is dat 2+59+93=154=0(11). Wat we dan overhouden is 83=6(11). Het grondgetal moet dus zijn 8(11). De 6 staat voor 600, en is dus 6(11). De 7 is 7(11), samen 13= 2(11). We moeten dus een tiental vinden 6(11).

10 is een oneven exponent, waarvoor het ”tegenvoetereffect”op een andere manier opgaat. Voor de duidelijkheid volgt een tabel. 50 =6(11), zodat het eindantwoord van de opgave is 657.
Waarom die aanhankelijkheid aan het getal 11? Wel: 3³, 6³ en 9³ zijn alle 0(9). Dan hoeven we over 27 al helemaal niet meer te praten bij derde machten: (3,6,9,12,15,18,21,24,27)³ zijn alle 0(27).

De aantrekkelijkheid van het getal 11 kan nog worden vergroot door het met 3 te vermenigvuldigen.

Om te beginnen: om deze gegevens zinvol te kunnen gebruiken moet men deze goed in het hoofd hebben zitten, wat, onmiddellijk toegegeven, zeker niet ieders werk is. U ziet dat er geen doublures zijn, zoals wel het geval is met 9 en 27.

Voor de volledigheid: ik “vond de 11 proef uit” toen ik ± 11 jaar was, en heb er later 33 aan toegevoegd, met name voor opgaande derde wortels, vanaf 18 cijfers en meer, en in het bijzonder wanneer de opgave eindigt op het cijfer 5.

 
37 is ook goed zult u zeggen. Ok, dat kan. Maar u zult opkijken van de volgende tabel:

Wat bij 37 opvalt is dat bij de derde macht elke modulo 3× voorkomt, waardoor het getal 37 bij deze exponent als proefgetal onbruikbaar wordt.
Kijkt u naar (1,10,26)³ alle 1(37) of (9, 12,16)³, alle 26(37).Enz

De rekenkundige verklaring is als 1³ = 1(37) en 10³ is ook 1(37) dan is (10²)³ ook 1(37). We stellen ook vast dat 10²= 26(37) .
Zo kunnen we zien dat bijv. (3, 30 en 4)³ alle 27(37)) zijn.

Over het getal 101 is op te merken dat men bij het indelen van het getal het beste vrnl in groepen van twee cijfers moet gaan werken en dan +, – , + , – moet doen. Dit omdat 100= 100(101) of -1(101) en dat 10.000 = 1(101), immers 99×101= 9999.

Het getal 197.459.862.512 = 19 74 59 86 25 12 = 12 – 25 + 86 – 59 + 74 – 19 = 69(101). Het controleren van een vermenigvuldiging mbv het getal 101 lijkt me alleen uitvoerbaar ten koste van grote inspanningen.

Voor de volledigheid testen we de eerder besproken vermenigvuldiging 6541×2879 met als uitkomst 18 83 15 39 een keer met behulp van modulo 101.

We weten dat bij alle getallen van 2 cijfers die vermenigvuldigd worden met 101 we 2× achter elkaar hetzelfde getal krijgen. Dus 65 × 101= 6565. Dan is 6541 101-24 = 77(101). Voor 2879 stellen we vast dat als 2828 = 0(101) dan is 2879 = 51(101). Vervolgens doen we 77×51= 3927 =3939-12= 101-12=89(101).
We tellen nu bij de uitkomst vrnl. En stellen tevreden vast: +39-15+83-18= 89(101).

©A.W.A.P. Bouman

Modulo calculation

Modulo calculation

Modulo Calculation 1.

As I use modulo Calculation for almost every kind of calculation operation I asked Mathematics Professor Stevenhagen “how important is modulo calculation for a mathematician?”, self being an aritmetician. The answer, to my surprise: “Mathematics without modulo calculation is as impossible as chemistry without atoms”.

I’ll tell something about M(odulo) C(alculation), without giving the mathematic evidence, only the use.

MC is working with remainder classes. There may be several manners of writing, mostly I do 3(7) with which I mean that a given number divided by 7 has a remainder 3. So the number between brackets is the modulo. In Modulo Calculation the quotient of a division is not important, it is the remainder that counts.

In 1949 being 10 years old on the primary school I was taught the 9-test (my teacher possibly did not know the word mc) – as a way to test a multiplication. Calculation machines did not yet exist by far, but anyhow a multiplication should be checked on the accuracy of the answer.

One possibility is to do the multiplication again, with the risk that the same error is made again.

To do the 9-test the individual digits of a number are added and the sum of this is divided by 9. This is very simple as 10÷9 = 1(9) so every 10, 100, 1.000 etc = 1(9).

After having ascertained the remainders of the factors of a multiplication we multiply these remainders and ascertain the remainder of the result. This should be in accordance with the remainder of the whole multiplication.

Modulo Calculation
9 Test

67 6+7=13= 4(9)
89 × 8+9=17= 8(9)

5963 5+9+6+3=23=5(9)
Test 4×8=32=5(9)

As the remainders are in accordance you may suppose your result to be correct. The mathematician will say “There is a chance of 1 out of 9 that nevertheless the result is not correct. This means that the greater the modulo, the less is the chance of an error. But also the bigger the modulo, the more it is difficult to work with.

Should you be more confident with the 9-test you’ll see with 5963 that you can ignore the 9, and as 6+3=0(9) t00, you only have to consider the 5.

Now the same 9-test with bigger numbers.

6541 6+5+4+1=16= 7(9)
2879 × 2+8+7+9=26= 8(9)
18.83.15.39
1+8+8+3+1+5+3+9=20=2(9)
When you have more experience you’ll immediately see the 18, which can be ignored, and the 15+39=54=0(9), so you only have to consider the 83, which is 2(9).

Test 7×8=56=2(9)

Do some multiplications and check the results with the 9-test.
My teacher told us there were a risk with the 9-test: if in the result of the multiplication two digits would be interchanged, the 9-test would not reveal that. A surprising idea led me to the 11-test, which I bethought my self. It is simple to see: 24 and 42 are both 6(9), 24=2(11) and 42= 9(11). Later on I treat the 11- test.

ADDITION

Let’s never forget: modulo Calculation can be adapted with every kind of operation. In the German MCWC one of the tasks is 10 additions of 10 ten digit numbers. They are aligned vertically. There are people who have in this matter a speed second to none, far beyond my capacities.

Working out the 9 test with the individual numbers:
84563931: in this number you can ignore the group 45639, being 0(9). Add only 8+3+1= 3(9).
67929583: in this number you can ignore the group 7929, being 0(9). Add only 6+5+8+3= 4(9).
12983747: in this number you can ignore the 9 and the group 747, being 0(9). Add only 1+2+8+3=5(9).
79895631: in this number you can ignore 9, 9, 6 and 3. Add only 7+8+5+1=3(9)
28586837: in this number you can ignore the group 837. Add only 28586=2(9).
35352396: in this number you can ignore the group 396. Add only 3+5+3+5+2=0(9).
3+4+5+3+2+0=8(9).

The final answer 309312125: 3+3+1+2+1+2+5=8(9).

Please do not forget that working with test numbers is my “second nature”. And I take it for granted that it inevitably takes some seconds, a correct answer gives points, a quick and incorrect one does not .

In the same way a subtraction:

84320915083157 – 34982381268689 =
84320915083157= 8+4+3+2+1+5+8+3+1+5+7= 2(9)

34982381268689=3+4+8+2+3+2+6+8+6+8=5(9).

The difference between the numbers has to be 2-5=6(9).

Final answer 49428533814468=4+4+2+8+5+3+3+6+8=6(9).

The 11 Test

I accustomed myself to split the numbers in groups of 2 digits, starting from right. In 4 digit numbers I add 2 groups of 2 digits, as 100=1(11).

67 67=1(11)
89 × 89=1(11)

5963 59+63=122=1+22=1(11)
Test 1×1=1(11)

65 41 65+41=106=7(11) or 10+8=7(11)
28 79 × 28+79=107=8(11) or 6+2=8(11)

18.83.15.39 18+83+15+39=155=1(11),
If you are accustomed with the 11-test you’ll quickly see that 18+15=0(11), so you can ignore them, you can see 83 and 39 both as 6(11) so that you can simplify the addition to 6+6=1(11).

Test: 7×8=56=1(11).

Integer Divisions

18373153 ÷ 2791 =

Before make a test, convince yourself that the chosen modulo is not the same in the dividend and in the divider. In this case checking is impossible: 0(9) ÷ 0(9) can be any number.

9-test. In this example the dividend is 4(9) and the divider is 1(9), so the answer has to be 4(9) .

11-test. The dividend is 7(11) and the divider is 8(11), so the answer has to be 5(11).

The quotient of this division = 6583, which indeed is 4(9) and 5(11).

Integer Square Roots.

Sqrt 97436641.

The radient is 4(9) so the answer is either 2 or 7(9).
The radient is 5(11), so the answer has to be either 4 or 7(11).
It depends on your knowledge of the squares how you proceed. Let’s suppose you know the squares till 100. You’ll quickly see the answer from left begins with 98, 8(9). So doing the 9-test the other 2 digits have to be also 8(9). Furthermore it is evident that the last number has to be either 1 or 9. there are 4 possibilities for a square under 100 which end on 41: 21, 29, 71, 79. Out of these for 71 is the only one who meets the requirement being 8(9). So final answer 9871.

Ok, the first two digits of the answer are 98, 10(11). So if the answer is 4(11) the last digits have to be 5(11) and if the answer is 7(11) the last digits are 8(11). Out of 21, 29, 71, 79 we know the moduli are resp. 10, 7, 5 and 2 (11). Out of 4 and 7 (11) we can only make a combination which meets the requirements with 71, and 9871 indeed is 4(11).

Integer Cubic Roots.

Cubic root of 33 23 80 51 99 83.

Modulo 9.

We start with havinbg a look at 332380. As 328509>323380<343000, the first digits of the answer are 69. This approach supposes the knowledge of the cubics 1-100. If this is not the case, no special problem.

The radient is 0(9) so the answer can be either 0, 3 or 6(9). Immediately is to be seen that the first digit of the answer is 6, as 216> 332< 343(7^3). The last one has to be a 7 as only 7^3 gives a 3 on the end.
We now could look for the 3rd digit. We have a number ….83 and know that 7³=343. We know too (a+b)³ = a³+3a²b+3ab²+b³ of which the part 3ab² gives us the ten of (a+b)³ . 43 + 3ab²= 83, so 3ab²=40. 3a7²=40, so a=20. We now have a partial answer 6?27.

The final answer can be 6027, 6327, 6627 or 6927.

Now we do the Newton method: 332-216(6^3) = 116, to divide by 6^2*3=108. This is however >1, and this cannot be, the final answer being <7. But is helps us to conclude that the final answer has to be 6927, as 9 is the most near to 1.

Modulo11.

Cubic root of 33 23 80 51 99 83.

For ascertaining the modulo 11 we can ignore the 33 and 99, both being 0(11) and work with 23, 1(11)+ 80, 3(11), 51, 7(11) and 83, 6(11). 1+3+7=0(11), so what remains is 83, 6(11).

The question is which number ^3 is 6(11). In odd powers there is only 1 possibility: 8. 8³=512=6(11). So the complete answer is 8(11).

Again the 1 st. digit of the answer is 6 and the last one is 7. Suppose we know also that the 3rd digit is 2, then we have 6X27. Take 60, 5(11) and add 27, 5(11) we have an answer 10(11). But we have to have 8(11). So which number do we have to add with 60 to get 8(11) . The answer is 9, for 10 + 9 = which is 8(11).
So the final answer is 6927.

Divisibility special

Divisibility special

Divisibility special

“Willaim Flash, king of the primes”. This very nice nick name was granted to me by Robert Fountain after my success with prime numbers in Gießen, November 2006. In this document I give explanation about my being so confident with prime numbers.

The history starts in 1954, when a mathematician tells me that a number is also divisible if it can be written as twice the sum of to squares on a different way. We’ll only discuss this theme now.

65 = 8² + 1² and 7² + 4². So it can be factorised and the prime factors themselves are the sum of 2 squares. Correct: 5 = 2² + 1² and 13 = 3² + 2².

From this time no – not so very big – number was safe for me. Owing to my profound knowledge of the squares up to 1.000 I could find out if a given number was twice the sum of 2 squares or not and if so by division find out the factors.

Eg 2993. A little bit tricky. Why? 93 can be composed as the sums of: 09+84, 29+64, 49+44, 69+24 and 89+04. Specially with numbers of 6 digits this is a lot of work. The way-out: to double and you get 5986. 86 can only be composed as the sum of 61 + 25, which means a considerable economisation of work. To reduce furthermore the quantity of work we take refuge to the 9-test. All the squares are (9) resp. 0, 1, 4, 7. On our search to the squares which can compose 5986=1(9) we have 19, 31, 69. We immediately can ignore 31, 31² being 7(9). And we find indeed: 5986 = 19² + 75² and 69² + 35². For finding the factors we reduce to resp. 47² + 28² by means of (47±28)/2 and 52² + 17² by means of (69±35)/2.

Finding the factors: take the even squares and do (52±28)/2 = 40 and 12. Take the odd squares and do (47±17)/2 = 32 and 15. 40 and 32 have common factor 8, 5× and 4×. 15 and 12 have common factor 3, 5× and 4×. First factor of the division 8³+3²=73. The other one 5²+4²=41.

This all brings us to the conclusion that – besides other criteria – a number certainly is prime if it can be written as only 1× the sum if 2 squares.

Is this all there is? No! Shortly later I thought about 3 combinations: 5×13×17, 1105. Well, here we find 4 combinations: the squares of resp. 4 + 33, 9 + 32, 23 + 24 and 32 + 9. This cried for a formula, which I found. The number of primes as described being n, the power is x, the number of combinations is n (x-1). The smallest possible combination is then 5×13×17×29= 32045. The amateurs can no find the 8 possible combinations of squares.

If 1 of the factors is square, eg 925, we have not 4 combinations, there are 3 combinations, of which surely 1 is with a 5. We find the square combinations 30 + 5, 22 + 21 and 27 + 14.

If 1 of the factors is ^3, 1625 = 5^3 × 13 we find 4 combinations, not 8, and 2 of them being with a 5. ( 40 + 5, 35 + 20, 37 + 16 and 29 + 28) .

To find the factors was always a lot of work. In a book of Dr. Rückle, Practice of calculating numbers, 1925. There I found important tips and now finding the factors is much easier.

I was given the phone number 20615346. I immediately saw 18 in it, so now we have 1145297. I started try and error and found 29 as a factor, division gave 39493, to double 78986= 2(9). We have to go the way of 19, 31, 69, 81 etc. The squares divisible by 3 can then be ignored, as 69, 81 etc. Also can be ignored the 19 etc squares with 161 and 561 as 25 squares with 425 and 825 do not exist .

The composing squares are: 281 + 5 and 181 + 215. The reduction: 143 + 138 and 198 + 17. Now we do (143±17)/2 and have 80 and 63. (198±138)/2 gives 168 and 30. We find as common factors for 168 and 63: 21, resp. 8 and 3 ×. For 80 and 30 we find 10, 8× and 3× too. So the factors of 39493 are 21²2 + 10² = 541 and 8² + 3² = 73.

In the meantime you will see that more than 50 years practising like this gives an enormous insight in the prime numbers.

Prime numbers are in daily practised used a.o. for the encryption of electronic messages. I do not know how difficult it is to find the factors of a number of 100 digits, which is the product of 2 primes of equal bigness. If we have a computer which can test 2.000.000.000.000 divisors in a second, it needs 1038 seconds to test. To get an idea of big numbers: a year is ± 3.107 seconds, men’s life is ± 2.1019 seconds. We can safely conclude the primes numbers asked for will never be found.

Willem Bouman

Delen

Delen

Delen.

1 Inleiding
Delen is de bewerking die omgekeerd is aan vermenigvuldigen, dat is het intrappen van een open deur.

We hebben allemaal de tafels van vermenigvuldiging geleerd, van 1-10 die de basis vormen van alle vermenigvuldigingen. Maar tafels van deling hebben we nooit geleerd. Hoe zouden die er trouwens uit moeten zien?

Ik geef enkele voorbeelden.

Hoe willen we dat kinderen uit het hoofd laten leren en op welke leeftijd? En met welk doel?

We onderscheiden delingen in opgaande, waarbij geen rest overblijft en niet opgaande waarbij een rest overblijft, die als rest wordt aangegeven of als decimalen achter de komma wordt genoteerd.

Voor de goede orde: het getal dat gedeeld wordt heet deeltal, het getal waardoor het deeltal gedeeld wordt heet deler en het antwoord wordt ook quotiënt genoemd.

Het is altijd verstandig te kijken naar het te verwachten aantal cijfers van het antwoord. Gangbaar is de gedachte dat het aantal cijfers van het antwoord weet je als je het aantal cijfers van het deeltal vermindert met het aantal cijfers van de deler: een getal van zes cijfers gedeeld door een getal van 2 cijfers levert een antwoord op van vier cijfers.

Dat is niet altijd het geval. Grondregel: als het eerste cijfer van het deeltal groter is dan het eerste cijfer van de deler komt er bij het antwoord 1 cijfer bij. Voorbeeld 18÷3 = 6 en 48÷3= 16. 1404÷18=78 en 3204÷18=178.
Opgaande deling.

Voorbeeld 47832÷8.

4÷8= 0 r 4, Omdat we een antwoord >1 nooit met een 0 laten beginnen schrijven we dat niet op.

47÷8 = 5 r 7. Het eerste niet nul cijfer van het antwoord is dus een 5. Antwoord zo ver 5

We trekken weer een cijfer uit het getal 47.832 bij en hebben dan 78.

78 ÷ 8 = 9 r 6, waardoor het tweede cijfer van het antwoord 9 is. Antwoord zo ver 59.

We trekken bij het volgende cijfer uit het deeltal en hebben dan 63.

63 ÷ 8 = 7 r 7 en trekken eer een cijfer uit het deeltal bij en hebben dan 72. Antwoord zo ver 597

72 ÷ 8 = 9. Eindantwoord 5979.

We hebben nu alle cijfers van het deeltal 47.832 opgebruikt met als resultaat dat het deeltal 47832 gedeeld door deler 8 als antwoord geeft 5.979 maal.

De deling is geheel en al uit het hoofd uitgevoerd zonder het maken van tussennotities.

2 Delen door een getal van twee cijfers.

Hapklare brokken
Ik kom nog terug op de kruismethode, zo u wilt de omgekeerde kruismethode omdat we bezig zijn met delen. Zelf denk ik dat het delen door een getal van twee cijfers geen onoverkomelijke moeilijkheid is, vooral als men de moeite neemt zich erin te trainen.

Als volgt 3483 ÷ 43. We splitsen het deeltal in 34 | 83 en de deler in 4 | 3.

We delen nu 34 ÷ 4 = 8 r 2 .

Bijtrekken het eerste cijfer achter de streep, de 8 zodat we hebben de rest 2, en de 8 dus 28.

28 – 3 × 8 = 4 ÷ 4 = 1 r 0, zodat we nu als antwoord hebben 81. De rest is 0, we kunnen hier dus onze bewerking stoppen.

25681 ÷ 61, dus 25 | 681 ÷ 6 | 1 .

25 ÷ 6 = 4 r 1, antwoord zo ver 4, en bijtrekken 6 zodat we krijgen 16

16 – 4 × 1 = 12 ÷ 6 = 2 r 0, antwoord zo ver 42, en bijtrekken 8

8 – 2 × 1 = 6 ÷ 6 = 1 r 0 . Eindantwoord 421.

3 Delen door een getal van drie cijfers

644028÷ 748, wie durft dat aan? Voor de duidelijkheid splitsen we beide getallen als volgt 644 | 028 en 74 | 8. Omdat 64< 74 weten we dat het antwoord drie cijfers zal hebben.

644 ÷ 74 = 8 r 52, antwoord nu 8

52×10=520 en 0 bijtrekken, en aftrekken 8( de 8 na 74) ×8=64 = 456.

456÷74= 6r 12, antwoord nu 86.

12×10=120 en 2 bijtrekken = 122 – 6×8( de 8 na 74) =74.

74÷74=1 r 0, antwoord dus 861. Omdat de rest 0 is zijn we dus klaar.

4 Delen door een getal van vier cijfers.

24421479 ÷ 3781 te splitsen als 244|21479 en 37|81.

244÷37 = 6 r 22, antwoord zo ver 6

22×10=220, bijtrekken 2 wordt 222 – 6×8=174÷37=4r26. antwoord zo ver 64

26×10=260, bijtrekken 1, wordt 261 – 4×8-6×1=223. Zie hier de kruismethode.

223÷37 = 6r1, maar omdat we na vermenigvuldigen met 10 nog weer moeten aftrekken kiezen we voor 5r38. Antwoord zo ver 645.

38×10=380, 4 bijtrekken wordt 384.

384-5×8-1×4=340

340÷37=9r7, antwoord zo ver 6459.

7×10=70, bijtrekken 7 wordt 77.

77-9×8-5 ×1=0÷37=0. Omdat de rest 0 is hebben we nu het complete antwoord 6459.

© A.W.A.P. Bouman 2009